TN HJR1208 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-15 - Meeting Canceled
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-15 - Meeting Canceled
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Urges every college and university in the State of Tennessee to establish a George Floyd Scholarship Fund.
Title
Urges every college and university in the State of Tennessee to establish a George Floyd Scholarship Fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-15 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-06-12 | House | Placed on cal. Delayed Bills Committee for 6/15/2020 |
2020-06-08 | House | Ref. to Delayed Bills Comm. |
2020-06-08 | House | Filed for introduction |