TN HJR1088 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-23 - Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-23 - Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Melvin J. Malone, UT board of trustees
Title
Melvin J. Malone, UT board of trustees
Sponsors
Rep. Glen Casada [R] | Rep. David Hawk [R] | Rep. Bill Dunn [R] | Rep. Harry Brooks [R] |
Rep. Jimmy Matlock [R] | Rep. Eddie Smith [R] | Rep. Roger Kane [R] | Rep. John DeBerry [D] |
Rep. Mark White [R] | Rep. Johnnie Turner [D] | Sen. Raumesh Akbari [D] | Rep. Debra Moody [R] |
Rep. Craig Fitzhugh [D] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. Karen Camper [D] | Rep. JoAnne Favors [D] |
Rep. Larry Miller [D] | Rep. Johnny Shaw [D] | Rep. Barbara Cooper [D] | Rep. Harold Love [D] |
Rep. Joe Towns [D] | Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D] | Rep. Rick Staples [D] | Rep. John Forgety [R] |
Rep. Barry Doss [R] | Rep. Mike Carter [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 85 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-04-19 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-04-19 | House | Adopted, Ayes 85, Nays 2, PNV 4 |
2018-04-19 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-17 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-17 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-16 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-12 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-12 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2018 |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/12/2018 |
2018-04-11 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-04-09 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 4/11/2018 |
2018-04-09 | House | Intro., ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2018-04-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-09 | House | Filed for intro. |