TN HJR1047 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Chancellor Telford Earl Forgety, Jr.
Title
A RESOLUTION to recognize the Honorable Telford Earl Forgety, Jr., on the occasion of his retirement as Chancery Court Judge of the 4th and 5th Judicial Districts of the State of Tennessee.
Sponsors
Rep. Andrew Farmer [R] | Rep. Jeremy Faison [R] | Rep. Bob Ramsey [R] | Rep. Dale Carr [R] |
Rep. Jerry Sexton [R] | Rep. Jerome Moon [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | Signed by Governor. | |
2022-04-14 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-04-13 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-04-13 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/11/2022 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2022-04-05 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2022-04-04 | House | Adopted, Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-31 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. 4/4/22 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-30 | House | Filed for introduction |