TN HJR1007 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-04 - Received from House, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-04 - Received from House, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
TLC Community Center, "Day of Hope and Healing"
Title
TLC Community Center, "Day of Hope and Healing"
Sponsors
Rep. Debra Moody [R] | Rep. Timothy Hill [R] | Rep. John Holsclaw [R] | Rep. Matthew Hill [R] |
Rep. James Van Huss [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2018-04-03 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-04-02 | House | Adopted, Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-04-02 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-29 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 4/2/18 |
2018-03-28 | House | Filed for intro. |