TN HJR0875 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-07 - Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. Delayed Bills Comm.
Pending: Senate Delayed Bills Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-07 - Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. Delayed Bills Comm.
Pending: Senate Delayed Bills Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Creates special committee to study coordination of interagency transportation.
Title
Creates special committee to study coordination of interagency transportation.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Harmon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-07 | Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. Delayed Bills Comm. | |
2010-04-05 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2010-04-05 | Adopted, Ayes 96, Nays 0 | |
2010-04-01 | Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/5/2010 | |
2010-03-31 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 04/01/2010 | |
2010-03-30 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2010-03-24 | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 03/30/2010 | |
2010-03-23 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on s/c cal Public Safety of TR for 03/23/2010 | |
2010-03-09 | Assigned to s/c Public Safety of TR | |
2010-03-04 | Intro., ref. to Transportation Committee | |
2010-03-03 | Filed for intro. |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HJR0875&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HJR0875.pdf |