TN HJR0830 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-28 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-28 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Sarah Arnold, Women's World Gliding Champion
Title
Sarah Arnold, Women's World Gliding Champion
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Howell [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-28 | Signed by Governor. | |
2020-02-27 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-02-25 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-02-25 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 2/24/2020 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-02-13 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2020-02-13 | House | Adopted, Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 2 |
2020-02-10 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 2/13/20 |
2020-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |