TN HJR0801 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 57-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 57-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Urges the federal government to do all within its power to secure the U.S. border.
Title
A RESOLUTION relative to securing this nation's borders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1 (Y: 70 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1 (Y: 69 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Motion to Concur (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 2 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 75 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 74 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1 (Y: 69 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Motion to Concur (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 2 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 75 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 74 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Signed by Governor. | |
2024-04-18 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-17 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-17 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2024-04-16 | House | H. concurred in S. am. no. 1 Ayes 69, Nays 22 PNV 0 HJR0801 |
2024-04-15 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/16/2024 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Concurred as amended, Ayes 26, Nays 4 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0936) |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/11/2024 |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Recommended for concurrence, as amended, by Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/19/2024 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2024-02-27 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2024-02-26 | House | Adopted, Ayes 74, Nays 20, PNV 0 |
2024-02-26 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-22 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/26/2024 |
2024-02-21 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/22/2024 |
2024-02-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-14 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-02-12 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-07 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 2/14/2024 |
2024-02-07 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 2/7/2024 |
2024-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2024-01-30 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-01-29 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-01-29 | House | Intro., ref. to State Government Committee |
2024-01-25 | House | Filed for introduction |