TN HJR0795 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
William Curtis, Cannon County High School Teacher of the Year.
Title
William Curtis, Cannon County High School Teacher of the Year.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar cal. for 3/27/2014 |
2014-03-24 | House | Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. |
2014-03-20 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2014-03-20 | House | Adopted, Ayes 94, Nays 0 |
2014-03-18 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 3/20/14 |
2014-03-17 | House | Filed for intro. |