TN HJR0701 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 64-18)
Status: Passed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Captain Victor G. Donoho

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION to recognize Captain Victor G. Donoho on the occasion of his retirement.

Sponsors

Rep. Lowell Russell [R]Rep. Mary Littleton [R]Rep. John Clemmons [D]Rep. Rebecca Alexander [R]
Rep. Charlie Baum [R]Rep. Bill Beck [D]Rep. Clark Boyd [R]Rep. Rush Bricken [R]
Rep. David Byrd [R]Rep. Kent Calfee [R]Rep. Karen Camper [D]Rep. Dale Carr [R]
Rep. Glen Casada [R]Rep. Scott Cepicky [R]Rep. Mark Cochran [R]Rep. John Crawford [R]
Rep. Michael Curcio [R]Rep. Tandy Darby [R]Rep. Clay Doggett [R]Rep. Rick Eldridge [R]
Rep. Jeremy Faison [R]Rep. Andrew Farmer [R]Rep. Ron Gant [R]Rep. Johnny Garrett [R]
Rep. John Gillespie [R]Rep. Bruce Griffey [R]Rep. Rusty Grills [R]Rep. Yusuf Hakeem [D]
Rep. Mark Hall [R]Rep. G Hardaway [D]Rep. Torrey Harris [D]Rep. Kirk Haston [R]
Rep. David Hawk [R]Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R]Rep. Esther Helton [R]Rep. Gary Hicks [R]
Rep. Tim Hicks [R]Rep. Jason Hodges [D]Rep. John Holsclaw [R]Rep. Dan Howell [R]
Rep. Bud Hulsey [R]Rep. Chris Hurt [R]Rep. Darren Jernigan [D]Rep. Curtis Johnson [R]
Rep. Gloria Johnson [D]Rep. Kelly Keisling [R]Rep. Justin Lafferty [R]Rep. William Lamberth [R]
Rep. Tom Leatherwood [R]Rep. Harold Love [D]Rep. Pat Marsh [R]Rep. Sam McKenzie [D]
Rep. Larry Miller [D]Rep. Debra Moody [R]Rep. Jerome Moon [R]Rep. Brandon Ogles [R]
Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D]Rep. Dennis Powers [R]Rep. Bob Ramsey [R]Rep. Jay Reedy [R]
Rep. Tim Rudd [R]Rep. Cameron Sexton [R]Rep. Jerry Sexton [R]Rep. Johnny Shaw [D]
Rep. Paul Sherrell [R]Rep. Robin Smith [R]Rep. Mike Sparks [R]Rep. Mike Stewart [D]
Rep. Bryan Terry [R]Rep. Dwayne Thompson [D]Rep. Joe Towns [D]Rep. Ron Travis [R]
Rep. Kevin Vaughan [R]Rep. Greg Vital [R]Rep. Todd Warner [R]Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R]
Rep. Mark White [R]Rep. Sam Whitson [R]Rep. Ryan Williams [R]Rep. John Windle [D]
Rep. Dave Wright [R]Rep. Jason Zachary [R]

Roll Calls

2022-01-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-01 Signed by Governor.
2022-01-31HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2022-01-28SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2022-01-28HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2022-01-28HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2022-01-27SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2022-01-27SenateConcurred, Ayes 33, Nays 0
2022-01-25SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar for 1/27/2022
2022-01-24SenateReceived from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2022-01-20HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2022-01-20HouseAll Ayes added as Sponsors
2022-01-20HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2022-01-20HouseAdopted, Ayes 84, Nays 0, PNV 1
2022-01-19HouseIntro., placed on H. consent cal. 1/20/2022
2022-01-19HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback