TN HJR0648 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 68-23)
Status: Passed on February 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-05 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 68-23)
Status: Passed on February 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-05 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for affixing plaque at Representative Lois DeBerry's desk in House chambers to commemorate her legislative service.
Title
Provides for affixing plaque at Representative Lois DeBerry's desk in House chambers to commemorate her legislative service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-05 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-02-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-02-01 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-02-01 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 2/1/2018 |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-01-24 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-01-24 | House | All Ayes added as Sponsors |
2018-01-24 | House | Adopted, Ayes 99, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-01-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-01-22 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 1-24-18 |
2018-01-22 | House | Filed for intro. |