TN HJR0557 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 63-25)
Status: Passed on February 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-19 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 63-25)
Status: Passed on February 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-19 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
1966 Pearl High School varsity basketball team
Title
1966 Pearl High School varsity basketball team
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-19 | Signed by Governor. | |
2016-02-18 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-02-18 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2016-02-18 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 2/17/2016 |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2016-02-09 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2016-02-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-02-08 | House | Adopted, Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2016-02-04 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 2/8/16 |
2016-02-03 | House | Filed for intro. |