TN HJR0468 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-25 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-25 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Claudette Riley Sisk
Title
Claudette Riley Sisk
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-20 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-13 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-13 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-25 | Signed by Governor. | |
2016-01-25 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-01-21 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2016-01-21 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 28, Nays 0 |
2016-01-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 1/20/2016 |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2016-01-13 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2016-01-13 | House | Adopted, Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2016-01-12 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 1/13/16 |
2016-01-11 | House | Filed for intro. |