TN HJR0268 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-25 - H. subst. & concurred in SJR271
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-25 - H. subst. & concurred in SJR271
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
James Jones, Fish and Wildlife Commission
Title
James Jones, Fish and Wildlife Commission
Sponsors
Rep. John Ragan [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | House | H. subst. & concurred in SJR271 |
2019-03-21 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/25/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/21/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-03-07 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 3/13/2019 |
2019-03-07 | House | R/S Intro., ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2019-03-07 | House | Filed for introduction |