TN HJR0195 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-25 - H. subst. & concurred in SJR 201
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-25 - H. subst. & concurred in SJR 201
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Dr. David "Hank" Wright, Tennessee Fish and Wildlife Commission
Title
Dr. David "Hank" Wright, Tennessee Fish and Wildlife Commission
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | House | H. subst. & concurred in SJR 201 |
2019-03-21 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/25/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/21/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 3/13/2019 |
2019-02-14 | House | Intro., ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HJR0195&ga=111 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Bill/HJR0195.pdf |