TN HJR0190 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-02 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-02 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Amanda Thompson, Tennessee Bankers Association's Financial Literacy Teacher of the Year for 2015.
Title
Amanda Thompson, Tennessee Bankers Association's Financial Literacy Teacher of the Year for 2015.
Sponsors
Rep. Dale Carr [R] | Rep. Andrew Farmer [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-02 | Signed by Governor. | |
2015-04-01 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2015-03-31 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2015-03-31 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 3/30/2015 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2015-03-24 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2015-03-23 | House | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2015-03-19 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 3/23/15 |
2015-03-19 | House | Filed for intro. |