TN HJR0171 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-25 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-25 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
"Safe Kids Week," April 26-May 3, 2009
Title
"Safe Kids Week," April 26-May 3, 2009
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-03-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-25 | Signed by Governor. | |
2009-03-20 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2009-03-19 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2009-03-19 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2009-03-19 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2009-03-19 | Concurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0 | |
2009-03-17 | Placed on Sen. Consent Calendar (2) cal. for 03/19/2009 | |
2009-03-17 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Consent cal. for 03/17/2009 | |
2009-03-09 | Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. S&L Gov. Comm. | |
2009-03-05 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2009-03-05 | Adopted, Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 1 | |
2009-03-04 | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. 3/5/09 | |
2009-03-03 | Filed for intro. |