TN HJR0132 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-03 - Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. E,A&NR Comm.
Pending: Senate Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-03 - Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. E,A&NR Comm.
Pending: Senate Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Urges department of environment and conservation and federal Office of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enforcement to study feasibility of reestablishing plant and animal species native to Tennessee’s coalfield areas.
Title
Urges department of environment and conservation and federal Office of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enforcement to study feasibility of reestablishing plant and animal species native to Tennessee’s coalfield areas.
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Holt [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-28 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Consent Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-06 - House - (VOICE VOTE) AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-28 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Consent Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-06 - House - (VOICE VOTE) AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-03 | House | Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. E,A&NR Comm. |
2013-04-01 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2013-04-01 | House | Adopted, Ayes 90, Nays 0 |
2013-03-28 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/1/2013 |
2013-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/28/2013 |
2013-03-12 | House | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2013-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 3/12/2013 |
2013-03-06 | House | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2013-02-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/6/2013 |
2013-02-21 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2013-02-21 | House | Intro., ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2013-02-14 | House | Filed for intro. |