TN HJR0109 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-07 - Return to the Desk of the Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-07 - Return to the Desk of the Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes amendment to Article XI, Section 5 to allow the legislature to authorize casinos and games of chance associated with casinos to be operated in Tennessee.
Title
Proposes amendment to Article XI, Section 5 to allow the legislature to authorize casinos and games of chance associated with casinos to be operated in Tennessee.
Sponsors
Rep. Larry Miller [D] | Sen. Raumesh Akbari [D] | Rep. Rick Staples [D] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] |
Rep. Karen Camper [D] | Rep. Jason Powell [D] | Rep. Joe Towns [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-07 | House | Return to the Desk of the Clerk |
2018-01-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/7/2018 |
2018-01-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2018-01-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 1/17/2018 |
2017-04-12 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 1st Calendar of 2018 |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 4/12/2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | Reset on Final cal. of State Government Subcommittee |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-08 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/8/2017 |
2017-03-01 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/8/2017 |
2017-02-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/1/2017 |
2017-02-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2017-02-13 | House | Intro., ref. to State Government Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed for intro. |