TN HJR0093 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Proposes amendment to authorize casino gaming and require that state revenues derived from casino gaming be allocated for K-12 education projects and programs as determined by the general assembly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION to propose an amendment to Article XI, Section 5, of the Constitution of Tennessee, relative to casinos.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-30HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee of State Government Committee
2021-03-24HousePlaced on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/30/2021
2021-02-24HouseAssigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
2021-02-11HouseIntro., ref. to State Government Committee
2021-02-10HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback