TN HJR0089 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Failed in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Proposes an amendment to Article VI, Section 13 of the Constitution of Tennessee to allow for the election of clerks and masters for a term of four years, rather than appointment for a term of six years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposes an amendment to Article VI, Section 13 of the Constitution of Tennessee to allow for the election of clerks and masters for a term of four years, rather than appointment for a term of six years.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26HouseFailed in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary
2019-02-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/26/2019
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
2019-01-31HouseIntro., ref. to Judiciary
2019-01-30HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback