TN HJR0085 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-03 - Received from House, refer to Senate Health & Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Urges DEA to reclassify marijuana as a Schedule II drug.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION relative to the reclassification of marijuana under the Controlled Substances Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 81 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-03SenateReceived from House, refer to Senate Health & Welfare Committee
2021-04-29HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2021-04-29HouseAdopted as am., Ayes 81, Nays 6, PNV 0
2021-04-29HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0093)
2021-04-26HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/29/2021
2021-04-26HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/26/2021
2021-03-17HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2021-03-10HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 3/17/2021
2021-03-10HouseAction def. in Health Committee to 3/17/2021
2021-03-03HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 3/10/2021
2021-03-02HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee
2021-02-24HousePlaced on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/2/2021
2021-02-10HouseAssigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
2021-02-10HouseIntro., ref. to Health Committee -- Criminal Justice
2021-02-09HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback