TN HJR0056 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-18 - Received from House, refer to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-18 - Received from House, refer to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Urges review of adjunct faculty compensation at public institutions of higher education.
Title
Urges review of adjunct faculty compensation at public institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Sparks [R] | Rep. Andy Holt [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-04-17 | House | Adopted, Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-04-08 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/17/19 |
2019-04-08 | House | Objected to on Consent Calendar. |
2019-04-04 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/8/2019 |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/4/2019 |
2019-03-27 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Education for 3/27/2019 |
2019-03-19 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 3/19/2019 |
2019-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c House Higher Education Subcommittee |
2019-01-24 | House | Intro., ref. to Education |
2019-01-23 | House | Filed for introduction |