TN HJR0044 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-13 - H. subst. & concurred in SJR 31
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-13 - H. subst. & concurred in SJR 31
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Confirms the appointment of persons to the state university board of Tennessee Technological University.
Title
Confirms the appointment of persons to the state university board of Tennessee Technological University.
Sponsors
Rep. David Hawk [R] | Rep. Glen Casada [R] | Rep. Ryan Williams [R] | Rep. Harry Brooks [R] |
Rep. Mark White [R] | Rep. John Windle [D] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. Gerald McCormick [R] |
Rep. Joe Towns [D] | Rep. Ron Travis [R] | Rep. Craig Fitzhugh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-13 | House | H. subst. & concurred in SJR 31 |
2017-02-13 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-09 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/13/2017 |
2017-02-08 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/9/2017 |
2017-02-07 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-02-02 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-01 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 2/7/2017 |
2017-01-30 | House | Intro., ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2017-01-24 | House | Filed for intro. |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HJR0044&ga=110 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Bill/HJR0044.pdf |