TN HJR0006 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-06 - H. subst. & concurred in SJR 11
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-06 - H. subst. & concurred in SJR 11
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Thomas A. H. White, Tennessee education lottery board of directors
Title
Thomas A. H. White, Tennessee education lottery board of directors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Consent Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-29 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-31 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Consent Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-29 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-06 | House | H. subst. & concurred in SJR 11 |
2013-02-06 | House | Motion to reconsider adopted. |
2013-02-06 | House | Motion to lift from table adopted. |
2013-02-04 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2013-02-04 | House | Adopted, Ayes 94 Nays 0 |
2013-01-31 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 2/4/2013 |
2013-01-30 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 1/31/2013 |
2013-01-29 | House | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2013-01-23 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 1/29/2013 |
2013-01-10 | House | Intro., ref. to Education Committee |
2013-01-09 | House | Filed for intro. |