TN HB9002 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on October 21 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-10-29 - No action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, permits an election for school board members to be conducted on a partisan basis; permits a person seeking a position on a school board to campaign as the nominee or representative of a political party. - Amends TCA Title 2 and Title 49, Chapter 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2 and Title 49, Chapter 2, relative to local boards of education.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-29HouseNo action taken
2021-10-29HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee of Extraordinary Session III for 10/29/2021
2021-10-28HouseReset on Final cal. of Calendar & Rules Committee of Extraordinary Session III
2021-10-28HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee of Extraordinary Session III for 10/28/2021
2021-10-28HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee of Extraordinary Session III
2021-10-28HousePlaced on cal. Elections Committee of Extraordinary Session III for 10/28/2021
2021-10-28HouseP2C, ref. to Elections Committee of Extraordinary Session III
2021-10-27HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-10-21HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB9003 (Crossfiled) 2021-10-28 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback