TN SB9003 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-28 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-28 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, permits an election for school board members to be conducted on a partisan basis; permits a person seeking a position on a school board to campaign as the nominee or representative of a political party. - Amends TCA Title 2 and Title 49, Chapter 2.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2 and Title 49, Chapter 2, relative to local boards of education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-28 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB9002 (Crossfiled) 2021-10-29 - No action taken