TN HB8003 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on October 15 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-10-19 - Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee of Extraordinary Session II
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, clarifies that a claimant who chooses to leave employment because the employer required its employees to receive immunization or vaccination is not disqualified from receiving unemployment benefits based on that choice; specifies that benefits will not be reduced or denied for separation from employment caused by refusal to receive an immunization or vaccination. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2; Title 10, Chapter 7, Part 5; Title 14; Title 50; Title 64; Title 67, Chapter 5, Part 5 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2; Title 10, Chapter 7, Part 5; Title 14; Title 50; Title 64; Title 67, Chapter 5, Part 5 and Title 68, relative to benefitting a new authority anticipated to be created through the governor's call to convene the 2nd Extraordinary Session of the One Hundred and Twelfth General Assembly on October 18, 2021.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-19HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee of Extraordinary Session II
2021-10-19HousePlaced on cal. Health and Safety Committee of Extraordinary Session II for 10/19/2021
2021-10-19HouseP2C, ref. to Health and Safety Committee of Extraordinary Session II
2021-10-18HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-10-15HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback