TN HB7022 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 36-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-21 - P2C, ref. to Education 345 of Extraordinary Session
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the state, subject to appropriation, to increase state funding to the LEAs in the BEP instructional salaries and wages category in the 2020-2021 fiscal year and in the 2021-2022 fiscal year in the amounts identified in the general appropriations act of the first extraordinary session of the 112th General Assembly; requires LEAs to provide base salary increases for classroom teachers using the increase in funding. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to increases in funding during the 2020-2021 and 2021-2022 fiscal years for teacher pay raises.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-21HouseP2C, ref. to Education 345 of Extraordinary Session
2021-01-20HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-01-19HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB7025 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-22 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback