TN HB3964 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 941
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 941
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, clarifies that any drug testing fee or other fee that was assessed and collected in the ninth judicial district before such fees were repealed in 2007 to be designated for use by the ninth judicial district drug task force. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4.
Title
As enacted, clarifies that any drug testing fee or other fee that was assessed and collected in the ninth judicial district before such fees were repealed in 2007 to be designated for use by the ninth judicial district drug task force. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 941 | |
2010-05-10 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2010-05-06 | Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/10/2010 | |
2010-05-05 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 05/06/2010 | |
2010-04-29 | Action Def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to 5/6/2010 | |
2010-04-28 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 04/29/2010 | |
2010-04-13 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2010-04-07 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 04/13/2010 | |
2010-04-06 | Action Def. in Judiciary Committee to 4/13/2010 | |
2010-03-31 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 04/06/2010 | |
2010-03-30 | Action Def. in Judiciary Committee to 4/6/2010 | |
2010-03-24 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 03/30/2010 | |
2010-03-24 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on s/c cal Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD for 03/24/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Assigned to s/c Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD | |
2010-02-25 | P2C, ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2010-02-22 | P1C. | |
2010-02-18 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3627 (Crossfiled) 2010-05-28 - Pub. Ch. 941
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB3964&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB3964.pdf |