TN HB3875 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 930
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 930
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises the membership of the task force on charter schools; adds the design and method of training for charter schools' board members to the list of subjects that the task force is required to address; changes the date by which the comptroller must report the charter school task force's findings and recommendations to the general assembly from February 2, 2010, to February 2, 2011. - Amends TCA Section 49-13-129.
Title
As enacted, revises the membership of the task force on charter schools; adds the design and method of training for charter schools' board members to the list of subjects that the task force is required to address; changes the date by which the comptroller must report the charter school task force's findings and recommendations to the general assembly from February 2, 2010, to February 2, 2011. - Amends TCA Section 49-13-129.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 930 | |
2010-05-06 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2010-04-29 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/06/10 | |
2010-04-29 | Reset on reg cal. for 5/06/10 | |
2010-04-26 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/29/10 | |
2010-04-26 | Reset on Reg cal. for 4/29/10 | |
2010-04-22 | Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/28/2010 | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 04/22/2010 | |
2010-04-14 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2010-04-07 | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 04/14/2010 | |
2010-04-07 | Action Def. in Education Committee to 4/14/2010 | |
2010-03-31 | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 04/07/2010 | |
2010-03-24 | Rec. for pass; ref to Education Committee | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on s/c cal K-12 of ED for 03/24/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Action Def. in s/c K-12 of ED to 3/24/2010 | |
2010-03-10 | Placed on s/c cal K-12 of ED for 03/17/2010 | |
2010-02-24 | Action Def. in s/c K-12 of ED to 3/10/2010 | |
2010-02-17 | Placed on s/c cal K-12 of ED for 02/24/2010 | |
2010-02-17 | Action Def. in s/c K-12 of ED to 2/24/2010 | |
2010-02-10 | Placed on s/c cal K-12 of ED for 02/17/2010 | |
2010-02-09 | Assigned to s/c K-12 of ED | |
2010-02-08 | P2C, ref. to Education Committee | |
2010-02-04 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-02-03 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3257 (Crossfiled) 2010-05-28 - Pub. Ch. 930
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB3875&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB3875.pdf |