TN HB3764 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 947
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 947
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the secretary of state to file a copy of the previous year's consolidated report on the Help America Vote Act requirements and payments to the finance, ways and means committees of both houses, the fiscal review committee, and the office of legislative budget analysis by February 1 of each year. - Amends TCA Title 2.
Title
As enacted, requires the secretary of state to file a copy of the previous year's consolidated report on the Help America Vote Act requirements and payments to the finance, ways and means committees of both houses, the fiscal review committee, and the office of legislative budget analysis by February 1 of each year. - Amends TCA Title 2.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Odom [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 947 | |
2010-03-25 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2010-03-18 | Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/25/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 03/18/2010 | |
2010-03-16 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2010-03-10 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 03/16/2010 | |
2010-03-09 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2010-03-03 | Placed on s/c cal Elections of S&LG for 03/09/2010 | |
2010-02-10 | Assigned to s/c Elections of S&LG | |
2010-02-08 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2010-02-04 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-02-01 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3894 (Crossfiled) 2010-05-28 - Pub. Ch. 947
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB3764&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB3764.pdf |