TN HB3709 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 934
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 934
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires that on and after July 1, 2010, as vacancies arise on the board of barber examiners, at least one of the four barber members must be an instructor, owner, employee, or manager of a barber school.
Title
As enacted, requires that on and after July 1, 2010, as vacancies arise on the board of barber examiners, at least one of the four barber members must be an instructor, owner, employee, or manager of a barber school.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Towns [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 934 | |
2010-05-05 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2010-05-04 | H. Placed on Tentative Regular Calendar for 5/05/10 | |
2010-05-04 | Reset on Tentative cal. for 5/05/10 | |
2010-04-29 | Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/3/2010 | |
2010-04-28 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 04/29/2010 | |
2010-04-27 | No Action Taken (off notice for cal. in Calendar & Rules) | |
2010-04-23 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 04/27/2010 | |
2010-04-22 | Action Def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to 4/27/2010 | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 04/22/2010 | |
2010-04-06 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2010-03-31 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 04/06/2010 | |
2010-03-31 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2010-03-24 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 03/31/2010 | |
2010-03-24 | Action Def. in s/c Budget of FW&M to 3/31/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 03/24/2010 | |
2010-03-16 | Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M | |
2010-03-16 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2010-03-10 | Placed on cal. Health & Human Resources Committee for 03/16/2010 | |
2010-03-09 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Health & Human Resources Committee | |
2010-03-03 | Placed on s/c cal Professional Occupations of HHR for 03/09/2010 | |
2010-02-09 | Assigned to s/c Professional Occupations of HHR | |
2010-02-03 | P2C, ref. to Health & Human Resources Committee | |
2010-02-01 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-28 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3421 (Crossfiled) 2010-05-28 - Pub. Ch. 934
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB3709&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB3709.pdf |