TN HB3577 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-27 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-27 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, changes incorrect cross-references to definition of domestic abuse victim and domestic abuse. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 3, Part 6; Title 39, Chapter 13; Title 40, Chapter 11, Part 1 and Title 40, Chapter 35, Part 3.
Title
As enacted, changes incorrect cross-references to definition of domestic abuse victim and domestic abuse. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 3, Part 6; Title 39, Chapter 13; Title 40, Chapter 11, Part 1 and Title 40, Chapter 35, Part 3.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-27 | Signed by Governor. | |
2010-05-19 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2010-05-17 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2010-05-17 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2010-05-14 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2010-05-13 | Passed S., Ayes 28, Nays 0 | |
2010-05-13 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2010-04-22 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2010-04-19 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2010-04-19 | Passed H., as am., Ayes 95, Nays 0 | |
2010-04-19 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA1324) | |
2010-04-15 | Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/19/2010 | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 04/15/2010 | |
2010-04-13 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2010-04-07 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 04/13/2010 | |
2010-04-07 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2010-03-31 | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD for 04/07/2010 | |
2010-03-31 | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD to 4/7/2010 | |
2010-03-24 | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD for 03/31/2010 | |
2010-03-24 | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD to 3/31/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD for 03/24/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD to 3/24/2010 | |
2010-03-10 | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD for 03/17/2010 | |
2010-02-09 | Assigned to s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD | |
2010-02-03 | P2C, ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2010-02-01 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-28 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3380 (Crossfiled) 2010-05-13 - Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA1335)