TN HB3479 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1141
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1141
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, redefines "eligible independent postsecondary institution" to include institutions that are members of an accrediting agency that is recognized by the U.S. department of education and the Council on Higher Education Accreditation; designates Knoxville College as an eligible independent postsecondary institution for purposes of lottery scholarships. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 9.
Title
As enacted, redefines "eligible independent postsecondary institution" to include institutions that are members of an accrediting agency that is recognized by the U.S. department of education and the Council on Higher Education Accreditation; designates Knoxville College as an eligible independent postsecondary institution for purposes of lottery scholarships. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 9.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-06 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1141 | |
2010-06-04 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2010-06-03 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/04/10 | |
2010-06-03 | Reset on Reg cal. 6/04/10 | |
2010-06-03 | Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/3/2010 | |
2010-06-03 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 06/03/2010 | |
2010-06-02 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2010-06-02 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 06/02/2010 | |
2010-06-02 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2010-05-27 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/02/2010 | |
2010-04-07 | Placed Behind the Budget | |
2010-03-31 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 04/07/2010 | |
2010-03-31 | Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M | |
2010-03-31 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2010-03-24 | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 03/31/2010 | |
2010-03-24 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Education Committee | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education of ED for 03/24/2010 | |
2010-03-10 | Action Def. in s/c Higher Education of ED to last calendar | |
2010-03-03 | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education of ED for 03/10/2010 | |
2010-02-04 | Assigned to s/c Higher Education of ED | |
2010-02-03 | P2C, ref. to Education Committee | |
2010-02-01 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-28 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2899 (Crossfiled) 2010-07-06 - Pub. Ch. 1141
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB3479&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB3479.pdf |