TN HB3469 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-20 - Pub. Ch. 771
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-20 - Pub. Ch. 771
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, adds Historic Rugby in Morgan County to the definition of premier type tourist resort for purposes of the sale of alcoholic beverages for on-premises consumption. - Amends TCA Section 57-4-102.
Title
As enacted, adds Historic Rugby in Morgan County to the definition of premier type tourist resort for purposes of the sale of alcoholic beverages for on-premises consumption. - Amends TCA Section 57-4-102.
Sponsors
Rep. Curry Todd [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-31 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-20 | Pub. Ch. 771 | |
2010-04-20 | Effective date(s) 04/14/10 | |
2010-04-14 | Signed by Governor. | |
2010-04-06 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2010-04-05 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2010-04-01 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2010-03-31 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2010-03-31 | Passed S., Ayes 23, Nays 5 | |
2010-03-31 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2010-03-17 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2010-03-15 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2010-03-15 | Passed H., Ayes 68, Nays 24, PNV 3 | |
2010-03-11 | Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/15/2010 | |
2010-03-10 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 03/11/2010 | |
2010-03-09 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2010-03-03 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 03/09/2010 | |
2010-03-02 | Action Def. in State & Local Government Committee to 3/9/2010 | |
2010-02-24 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 03/02/2010 | |
2010-02-24 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2010-02-17 | Placed on s/c cal Local Government of S&LG for 02/24/2010 | |
2010-02-17 | Action Def. in s/c Local Government of S&LG to 2/24/2010 | |
2010-02-10 | Placed on s/c cal Local Government of S&LG for 02/17/2010 | |
2010-02-10 | Assigned to s/c Local Government of S&LG | |
2010-02-03 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2010-02-01 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-28 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3545 (Crossfiled) 2010-04-20 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 771