TN HB3466 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-02 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Budget of FW&M of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-02 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Budget of FW&M of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases membership of Tennessee heritage conservation trust fund board of trustees from 11 to 13 with the speaker of each respective house appointing one trustee. - Amends TCA Title 11, Chapter 7 and Title 67, Chapter 4.
Title
As introduced, increases membership of Tennessee heritage conservation trust fund board of trustees from 11 to 13 with the speaker of each respective house appointing one trustee. - Amends TCA Title 11, Chapter 7 and Title 67, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe McCord [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-02 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Budget of FW&M of Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2010-05-27 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/03/2010 | |
2010-04-14 | Action Def. in s/c Budget of FW&M to last calendar | |
2010-04-07 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 04/14/2010 | |
2010-03-31 | Action Def. in s/c Budget of FW&M to 4/14/2010 | |
2010-03-24 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 03/31/2010 | |
2010-03-23 | Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M | |
2010-03-23 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on cal. Conservation & Environment Committee for 03/23/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Conservation & Environment Committee | |
2010-03-10 | Placed on s/c cal Parks & Tourism of CON for 03/17/2010 | |
2010-02-17 | Assigned to s/c Parks & Tourism of CON | |
2010-02-12 | Ref. to Conservation & Environment Committee | |
2010-02-03 | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. | |
2010-02-01 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-28 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3390 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-23 - Action Def. in S. E,C&T Comm. to 3/30/2010
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB3466&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB3466.pdf |