TN SB3390 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-23 - Action Def. in S. E,C&T Comm. to 3/30/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-23 - Action Def. in S. E,C&T Comm. to 3/30/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases membership of Tennessee heritage conservation trust fund board of trustees from 11 to 13 with the speaker of each respective house appointing one trustee. - Amends TCA Title 11, Chapter 7 and Title 67, Chapter 4.
Title
As introduced, increases membership of Tennessee heritage conservation trust fund board of trustees from 11 to 13 with the speaker of each respective house appointing one trustee. - Amends TCA Title 11, Chapter 7 and Title 67, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-23 | Action Def. in S. E,C&T Comm. to 3/30/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on S. E,C&T Comm. cal. for 03/23/2010 | |
2010-03-09 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. E,C&T Comm. | |
2010-02-01 | P2C, ref. to S. E,C&T Comm. | |
2010-01-28 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-28 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3466 (Crossfiled) 2010-06-02 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Budget of FW&M of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB3390&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB3390.pdf |