TN HB3370 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-05 - Rcvd. from H., P1C.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-05 - Rcvd. from H., P1C.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the TBI to report sexual offender registration and certain information to the FBI within 48 hours of receiving such information. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
As introduced, requires the TBI to report sexual offender registration and certain information to the FBI within 48 hours of receiving such information. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-05 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2010-04-01 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2010-04-01 | Passed H., as am., Ayes 98, Nays 0 | |
2010-04-01 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA1108) | |
2010-03-30 | Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/1/2010 | |
2010-03-26 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 03/30/2010 | |
2010-03-23 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 03/23/2010 | |
2010-03-16 | Action Def. in Judiciary Committee to 3/23/2010 | |
2010-03-10 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 03/16/2010 | |
2010-03-10 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2010-03-03 | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD for 03/10/2010 | |
2010-03-03 | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD to 3/10/2010 | |
2010-02-24 | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD for 03/03/2010 | |
2010-02-17 | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD to 3/3/2010 | |
2010-02-10 | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD for 02/17/2010 | |
2010-02-03 | Assigned to s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD | |
2010-02-03 | P2C, ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2010-02-01 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-28 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3697 (Crossfiled) 2010-04-27 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB3370&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB3370.pdf |