TN HB3232 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1143
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1143
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, changes the signage requirements for landowners who desire to prohibit hunting on their property; revises the exemption from storm water user fees for owners of agricultural land. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 9; Title 12; Title 16; Title 30; Title 36; Title 39; Title 40; Title 45; Title 47; Title 48; Title 49; Title 55; Title 56; Title 57; Title 61; Title 62; Title 67; Title 68; Title 69; Title 70 and Title 71.
Title
As enacted, changes the signage requirements for landowners who desire to prohibit hunting on their property; revises the exemption from storm water user fees for owners of agricultural land. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 9; Title 12; Title 16; Title 30; Title 36; Title 39; Title 40; Title 45; Title 47; Title 48; Title 49; Title 55; Title 56; Title 57; Title 61; Title 62; Title 67; Title 68; Title 69; Title 70 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe McCord [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-06 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1143 | |
2010-06-09 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2010-06-09 | R/S H. Placed on Regular Calendar 2 for 6/09/10 | |
2010-06-09 | R/S, Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2010-05-04 | Taken off notice for cal. in Commerce Committee | |
2010-04-29 | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 05/04/2010 | |
2010-04-28 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on s/c cal Industrial Impact of COM for 04/28/2010 | |
2010-04-14 | Action Def. in s/c Industrial Impact of COM to last calendar | |
2010-04-07 | Placed on s/c cal Industrial Impact of COM for 04/14/2010 | |
2010-03-31 | Action Def. in s/c Industrial Impact of COM to 4/14/2010 | |
2010-03-24 | Placed on s/c cal Industrial Impact of COM for 03/31/2010 | |
2010-03-24 | Assigned to s/c Industrial Impact of COM | |
2010-03-17 | Ref. to Commerce Committee | |
2010-02-01 | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. | |
2010-01-28 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-27 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3052 (Crossfiled) 2010-07-06 - Pub. Ch. 1143
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB3232&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB3232.pdf |