TN SB3052 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Pub. Ch. 1143
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Pub. Ch. 1143
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, changes the signage requirements for landowners who desire to prohibit hunting on their property; revises the exemption from storm water user fees for owners of agricultural land. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 9; Title 12; Title 16; Title 30; Title 36; Title 39; Title 40; Title 45; Title 47; Title 48; Title 49; Title 55; Title 56; Title 57; Title 61; Title 62; Title 67; Title 68; Title 69; Title 70 and Title 71.
Title
As enacted, changes the signage requirements for landowners who desire to prohibit hunting on their property; revises the exemption from storm water user fees for owners of agricultural land. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 9; Title 12; Title 16; Title 30; Title 36; Title 39; Title 40; Title 45; Title 47; Title 48; Title 49; Title 55; Title 56; Title 57; Title 61; Title 62; Title 67; Title 68; Title 69; Title 70 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-05 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-05 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-06 | Pub. Ch. 1143 | |
2010-07-06 | Effective date(s) 07/01/10 | |
2010-06-30 | Signed by Governor. | |
2010-06-23 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2010-06-22 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2010-06-16 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2010-06-14 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2010-06-09 | Passed H., Ayes 82, Nays 3, PNV 4 | |
2010-06-09 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA1674) | |
2010-06-09 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2010-06-09 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2010-06-09 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 32, Nays 0 | |
2010-06-09 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - SA1592) | |
2010-06-09 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA1072) | |
2010-06-07 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 06/09/2010 | |
2010-06-05 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (2) cal. for 06/05/2010 | |
2010-06-05 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 | |
2010-06-05 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/05/2010 | |
2010-05-17 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm. | |
2010-05-14 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/17/2010 | |
2010-03-29 | Ref. to S. F,W&M Comm. | |
2010-03-29 | Recalled from S. S&L Gov. Comm. | |
2010-01-28 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2010-01-27 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-27 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3232 (Crossfiled) 2010-07-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1143