TN HB3223 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-07 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-07 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, reclassifies the Tennessee Walking Horse cultural license plate as a new specialty earmarked license plate; changes the distribution of revenue from 80 percent to the arts and 20 percent to the highway fund to 50 percent to the TN Equine Association, 40 percent to the arts and 10 percent to the highway fund. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.
Title
As introduced, reclassifies the Tennessee Walking Horse cultural license plate as a new specialty earmarked license plate; changes the distribution of revenue from 80 percent to the arts and 20 percent to the highway fund to 50 percent to the TN Equine Association, 40 percent to the arts and 10 percent to the highway fund. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-14 - House - (VOICE VOTE) TRANSPORTATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-07 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2012-02-29 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 3/7/2012 | |
2012-02-22 | Action Def. in s/c Finance Subcommittee to 3/7/2012 | |
2012-02-15 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 2/22/2012 | |
2012-02-15 | Assigned to s/c Finance Subcommittee | |
2012-02-14 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2012-02-08 | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 2/14/2012 | |
2012-01-30 | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee | |
2012-01-26 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-25 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2897 (Crossfiled) 2012-03-01 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. T&S Com.