TN SB2897 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-01 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. T&S Com.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-01 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. T&S Com.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, reclassifies the Tennessee Walking Horse cultural license plate as a new specialty earmarked license plate; changes the distribution of revenue from 80 percent to the arts and 20 percent to the highway fund to 50 percent to the TN Equine Association, 40 percent to the arts and 10 percent to the highway fund. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.
Title
As introduced, reclassifies the Tennessee Walking Horse cultural license plate as a new specialty earmarked license plate; changes the distribution of revenue from 80 percent to the arts and 20 percent to the highway fund to 50 percent to the TN Equine Association, 40 percent to the arts and 10 percent to the highway fund. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Tracy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-01 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. T&S Com. | |
2012-01-26 | P2C, ref. to S. T&S Comm. | |
2012-01-25 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-24 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3223 (Crossfiled) 2012-03-07 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2897&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/SB2897.pdf |