TN HB3152 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1150
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1150
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises provisions governing the composition of the commission on firefighting personnel standards and education. - Amends TCA Section 4-24-104.
Title
As enacted, revises provisions governing the composition of the commission on firefighting personnel standards and education. - Amends TCA Section 4-24-104.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-06 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1150 | |
2010-05-05 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2010-05-04 | H. Placed on Tentative Regular Calendar for 5/05/10 | |
2010-05-04 | Reset on Tentative cal. for 5/05/10 | |
2010-04-22 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/03/10 | |
2010-04-22 | Reset on reg cal. for 5/03/10 | |
2010-04-12 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/22/10 | |
2010-04-12 | Reset on reg. cal. for 4/22/10 | |
2010-04-08 | Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/12/2010 | |
2010-04-07 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 04/08/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Action Def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to 4/8/2010 | |
2010-03-23 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 03/25/2010 | |
2010-03-16 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2010-03-10 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 03/16/2010 | |
2010-03-09 | Action Def. in State & Local Government Committee to 3/16/2010 | |
2010-03-03 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 03/09/2010 | |
2010-03-02 | Action Def. in State & Local Government Committee to 3/9/2010 | |
2010-02-24 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 03/02/2010 | |
2010-02-23 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2010-02-17 | Placed on s/c cal State Government of S&LG for 02/23/2010 | |
2010-02-17 | Assigned to s/c State Government of S&LG | |
2010-02-01 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2010-01-28 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-27 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3602 (Crossfiled) 2010-07-06 - Pub. Ch. 1150
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB3152&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB3152.pdf |