TN SB3602 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Pub. Ch. 1150
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Pub. Ch. 1150
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises provisions governing the composition of the commission on firefighting personnel standards and education. - Amends TCA Section 4-24-104.
Title
As enacted, revises provisions governing the composition of the commission on firefighting personnel standards and education. - Amends TCA Section 4-24-104.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Ketron [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-06-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 2 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 2 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-06 | Pub. Ch. 1150 | |
2010-07-06 | Effective date(s) 06/30/10 | |
2010-06-30 | Signed by Governor. | |
2010-06-23 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2010-06-22 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2010-06-09 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2010-06-09 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2010-06-04 | Conf. comm. report adopted, Ayes 89, Nays 2 | |
2010-06-03 | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 6/04/10 | |
2010-06-03 | Reset on Message cal. for 6/04/10 | |
2010-06-03 | H. Placed on Message #2 Calendar for 6/03/10 | |
2010-06-03 | Conf. comm. report adopted, Ayes 30, Nays 0 | |
2010-06-02 | Placed on Sen. Message Calendar (2) cal. for 06/03/2010 | |
2010-06-01 | Placed on Sen. Message Calendar (2) cal. for 06/02/2010 | |
2010-05-24 | Conf. comm. appointed. (Tindell, M. Turner & Haynes) | |
2010-05-24 | H. Placed on Message Calendar #2 for 5/24/10 | |
2010-05-24 | S. Conf. comm. appointed. (Ketron, Finney, Faulk) | |
2010-05-24 | S. refused to recede from its non-concurrence on H. am. 1 | |
2010-05-20 | Placed on Sen. Message Calendar (1) cal. for 05/24/2010 | |
2010-05-13 | H. refused to recede from am. no. 1 | |
2010-05-12 | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 5/13/10 | |
2010-05-10 | S. concurred in H. am. 2 | |
2010-05-10 | S. refused to concur in H. am. 1 | |
2010-05-07 | Placed on Sen. Message Calendar (1) cal. for 05/10/2010 | |
2010-05-05 | Passed H., as am., Ayes 92, Nays 2 | |
2010-05-05 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - HA1479) | |
2010-05-05 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA1098) | |
2010-05-05 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2010-05-05 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2010-04-29 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2010-04-29 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 27, Nays 1 | |
2010-04-29 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - SA1204) | |
2010-04-29 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0921) | |
2010-04-29 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 3 of 0 - SA1345) | |
2010-04-27 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 04/29/2010 | |
2010-03-31 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 5, Nays 1 PNV 3 | |
2010-03-25 | Placed on S. Govt. Ops. Comm. cal. for 03/31/2010 | |
2010-03-24 | Ref. to S. Govt. Ops. Comm. | |
2010-03-24 | Recalled from S. Cal. Comm. | |
2010-03-22 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 03/24/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | S. Reset on Cal. for 3/24/2010 | |
2010-03-15 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 03/17/2010 | |
2010-03-10 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 00 | |
2010-03-04 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 03/10/2010 | |
2010-03-03 | Action def. in S&L Gov't Comm to 3/10/10 | |
2010-02-25 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 03/03/2010 | |
2010-02-24 | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 3/3/2010 | |
2010-02-18 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 02/24/2010 | |
2010-02-10 | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 2/24/2010 | |
2010-02-05 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 02/10/2010 | |
2010-02-01 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2010-01-28 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-28 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3152 (Crossfiled) 2010-07-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1150