TN HB3133 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 925
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 925
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, clarifies the appeals process for tenured teachers who are dismissed by a local board of education; requires that if the commissioner of education who is initially appointed to the teacher evaluation advisory committee as chairperson ceases to be the commissioner of education because of resignation or retirement, then such former commissioner remains a member of the committee until the committee ceases to exist. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As enacted, clarifies the appeals process for tenured teachers who are dismissed by a local board of education; requires that if the commissioner of education who is initially appointed to the teacher evaluation advisory committee as chairperson ceases to be the commissioner of education because of resignation or retirement, then such former commissioner remains a member of the committee until the committee ceases to exist. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 925 | |
2010-04-22 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2010-04-20 | Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/22/2010 | |
2010-04-16 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 04/20/2010 | |
2010-04-14 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2010-04-07 | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 04/14/2010 | |
2010-03-31 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Education Committee | |
2010-03-31 | Action Def. in s/c K-12 of ED to 3/31/2010 | |
2010-03-24 | Placed on s/c cal K-12 of ED for 03/31/2010 | |
2010-03-24 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c K-12 of ED of Education Committee | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on s/c cal K-12 of ED for 03/24/2010 | |
2010-02-24 | Action Def. in s/c K-12 of ED to last calendar | |
2010-02-17 | Placed on s/c cal K-12 of ED for 02/24/2010 | |
2010-02-04 | Assigned to s/c K-12 of ED | |
2010-02-01 | P2C, ref. to Education Committee | |
2010-01-28 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-27 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3053 (Crossfiled) 2010-05-28 - Pub. Ch. 925
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB3133&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB3133.pdf |