TN HB3105 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-20 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 721
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-20 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 721
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits schools and boards of education from separating multiple birth siblings into different classrooms solely due to such children being multiple birth siblings. - Amends TCA Section 49-6-3102.
Title
As enacted, prohibits schools and boards of education from separating multiple birth siblings into different classrooms solely due to such children being multiple birth siblings. - Amends TCA Section 49-6-3102.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-20 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 721 | |
2010-04-05 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2010-04-01 | Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/5/2010 | |
2010-03-31 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 04/01/2010 | |
2010-03-10 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2010-03-03 | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 03/10/2010 | |
2010-03-03 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Education Committee | |
2010-02-24 | Placed on s/c cal K-12 of ED for 03/03/2010 | |
2010-02-24 | Action Def. in s/c K-12 of ED to 3/3/2010 | |
2010-02-17 | Placed on s/c cal K-12 of ED for 02/24/2010 | |
2010-02-04 | Assigned to s/c K-12 of ED | |
2010-02-01 | P2C, ref. to Education Committee | |
2010-01-28 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-27 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2480 (Crossfiled) 2010-04-20 - Pub. Ch. 721
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB3105&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB3105.pdf |