TN HB3061 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-20 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 837
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-20 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 837
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, changes time when department of revenue is notified of an annexation from prior to the annexation becoming effective to upon the annexation becoming effective. - Amends TCA Section 6-51-115.
Title
As enacted, changes time when department of revenue is notified of an annexation from prior to the annexation becoming effective to upon the annexation becoming effective. - Amends TCA Section 6-51-115.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-05 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-27 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-21 - House - (VOICE VOTE) S&LG SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: State & Local Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-27 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-21 - House - (VOICE VOTE) S&LG SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: State & Local Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-20 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 837 | |
2012-04-09 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2012-04-05 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/9/2012 | |
2012-04-04 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/5/2012 | |
2012-03-27 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2012-03-21 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 3/27/2012 | |
2012-03-21 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Placed on s/c cal S&LG Subcommittee for 3/21/2012 | |
2012-02-22 | Action Def. in s/c S&LG Subcommittee to special calendar | |
2012-02-15 | Placed on s/c cal S&LG Subcommittee for 2/22/2012 | |
2012-01-31 | Assigned to s/c S&LG Subcommittee | |
2012-01-26 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2012-01-25 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-24 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2987 (Crossfiled) 2012-06-20 - Pub. Ch. 837