TN HB3018 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 918
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 918
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits the advertising, promotion, and sale of international driver's licenses; establishes that such practices and other related acts violate the Tennessee Consumer Protection Act; imposes certain civil penalties on such violations. - Amends TCA Title 47.
Title
As enacted, prohibits the advertising, promotion, and sale of international driver's licenses; establishes that such practices and other related acts violate the Tennessee Consumer Protection Act; imposes certain civil penalties on such violations. - Amends TCA Title 47.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 918 | |
2010-05-05 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2010-04-29 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2010-04-29 | Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/5/2010 | |
2010-04-28 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 04/29/2010 | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on cal. Consumer & Employees Affairs Committee for 04/28/2010 | |
2010-04-21 | Action def. in Consumer & Employee Affairs to 4/28/2010 Mtg.Canceled | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on cal. Consumer & Employees Affairs Committee for 04/21/2010 | |
2010-04-14 | Action Def. in Consumer & Employees Affairs Committee to 4/21/2010 | |
2010-04-12 | Placed on cal. Consumer & Employees Affairs Committee for 04/14/2010 | |
2010-04-08 | Re-referred To: Consumer & Employees Affairs Committee | |
2010-04-07 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 04/08/2010 | |
2010-04-06 | Action Def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to 4/8/2010 | |
2010-04-01 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 04/06/2010 | |
2010-03-31 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2010-03-24 | Placed on cal. Consumer & Employees Affairs Committee for 03/31/2010 | |
2010-03-23 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Consumer & Employees Affairs Committee | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on s/c cal Consumer Affairs of C&EA for 03/23/2010 | |
2010-02-16 | Assigned to s/c Consumer Affairs of C&EA | |
2010-01-28 | P2C, ref. to Consumer & Employees Affairs Committee | |
2010-01-27 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-26 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2712 (Crossfiled) 2010-05-28 - Pub. Ch. 918
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB3018&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB3018.pdf |