TN HB2952 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-05 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-05 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the commissioner of correction to provide an annual report by February 1 to the criminal justice committee of the house of representatives and the judiciary committee of the senate detailing the department’s efforts to reduce recidivism among offenders who have been released from the custody of the department; requires the report to include evidence-based data detailing the efficacy of each relevant program within the department, including historical data to provide context. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 6; Title 40 and Title 41.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 6; Title 40 and Title 41, relative to recidivism.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-05 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2024-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2885 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-19 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee