TN HB2947 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 931
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 931
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes schools to establish an International Baccalaureate Programme fund or an Advanced Placement fund to receive donations or grants from individuals or from private corporations, associations, or other artificial entities, both nonprofit and for profit, that desire to help support an International Baccalaureate Programme or an Advanced Placement program offered or attempted to be established by the school. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2; Title 49, Chapter 3; Title 49, Chapter 5; Title 49, Chapter 6 and Title 49, Chapter 7, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, authorizes schools to establish an International Baccalaureate Programme fund or an Advanced Placement fund to receive donations or grants from individuals or from private corporations, associations, or other artificial entities, both nonprofit and for profit, that desire to help support an International Baccalaureate Programme or an Advanced Placement program offered or attempted to be established by the school. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2; Title 49, Chapter 3; Title 49, Chapter 5; Title 49, Chapter 6 and Title 49, Chapter 7, Part 1.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Coley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 931 | |
2010-05-12 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2010-05-06 | Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/12/2010 | |
2010-05-05 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 05/06/2010 | |
2010-05-04 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2010-04-28 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 05/04/2010 | |
2010-04-28 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 04/28/2010 | |
2010-04-16 | Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M | |
2010-04-14 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2010-04-07 | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 04/14/2010 | |
2010-03-31 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Education Committee | |
2010-03-31 | Action Def. in s/c Higher Education of ED to 3/31/2010 | |
2010-03-24 | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education of ED for 03/31/2010 | |
2010-03-24 | Action Def. in s/c Higher Education of ED to 3/31/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education of ED for 03/24/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Sponsor change. | |
2010-03-17 | Action Def. in s/c Higher Education of ED to 3/24/2010 | |
2010-03-10 | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education of ED for 03/17/2010 | |
2010-02-09 | Assigned to s/c Higher Education of ED | |
2010-01-28 | P2C, ref. to Education Committee | |
2010-01-27 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-26 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3304 (Crossfiled) 2010-05-28 - Pub. Ch. 931
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2947&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB2947.pdf |